Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-641
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-641
Title:CareFirst, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Chantal Attias, et al.
Docketed:November 1, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-7108)
   Decision Date:August 1, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 30 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 1, 2017)
Nov 22 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 1, 2017 to January 2, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 27 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 2, 2018.
Jan 02 2018Brief of respondents Chantal Attias, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 02 2018Brief of Chantal Attias, et al. in opposition not accepted for filing. (January 02, 2018)
Jan 12 2018Reply of petitioners CareFirst, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 20 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Matthew Owen Gatewood
    Counsel of Record
Eversheds Sutherland (US) LLP
700 Sixth Street, NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20001

MatthewGatewood@eversheds-sutherland.com
(202) 383-0122
Party name: CareFirst, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Christopher T. Nace
    Counsel of Record
Paulson & Nace
1025 Thomas Jefferson St NW
Suite 810
Washington, DC 20007

ctnace@paulsonandnace.com
202-463-1999
Party name: Chantal Attias, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543