Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-6368
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-6368
Title:Leon Ecourse-Westbrook, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 17, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-12040-F)
   Decision Date:July 18, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 13 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 16, 2017)
Nov 16 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 16, 2017 to December 18, 2017, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 17 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 18, 2017.
Dec 18 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 04 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2018.
Mar 07 2018Supplemental brief of petitioner Leon Ecourse-Westbrook filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 08 2018Second supplemental brief of petitioner Leon Ecourse-Westbrook filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 14 2018Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Sessions v. Dimaya, 584 U. S. ____ (2018).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robin Farnsworth
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
1 E. Broward Blvd.
Suite 1100
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Robin_Farnsworth@fd.org
9543567436
Party name: Leon Ecourse-Westbrook
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543