Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-6344
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-6344
Title:Jerry N. Brown, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 12, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1420)
   Decision Date:June 12, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:July 20, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 06 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 13, 2017)
Oct 24 2017Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Nov 02 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/21/2017.
Nov 13 2017Response Requested. (Due December 13, 2017)
Dec 06 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 13, 2017 to January 12, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 07 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 12, 2018.
Jan 09 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 12, 2018 to February 12, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 10 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 12, 2018.
Feb 12 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 15 2018Reply of petitioner Jerry N. Brown filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 15 2018Motion to Defer Consideration of Petition for Certiorari filed by petitioner Jerry N. Brown.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 15 2018Letter of February 15, 2018 from counsel for petitioner received.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018.
Apr 06 2018Supplemental brief of petitioner Jerry N. Brown filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 09 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 16 2018Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED to the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit for further consideration in light of that court's opinion in United States v. Naylor, __ F. 3d ___ (CA8 2018).
May 18 2018JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Dan Goldberg
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
818 Grand, Suite 300
Kansas City, MO 64106

dan_goldberg@fd.org
816-471-8282
Party name: Jerry N. Brown
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543