Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-633
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-633
Title:Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
New Hampshire
Docketed:October 31, 2017
Linked with 17A306
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of New Hampshire
   Case Numbers:(2016-0199)
   Decision Date:June 30, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 18 2017Application (17A306) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 28, 2017 to October 27, 2017, submitted to Justice Breyer.
Sep 20 2017Application (17A306) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until October 27, 2017.
Oct 27 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 30, 2017)
Nov 03 2017Waiver of right of respondent New Hampshire to respond filed.
Nov 29 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Nov 30 2017Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2017Response Requested. (Due January 16, 2018)
Jan 08 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 16, 2018 to January 30, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 09 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 30, 2018.
Jan 30 2018Brief of respondent New Hampshire in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/2/2018.
Feb 14 2018Reply of petitioner Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 05 2018Petition DENIED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

lisa.blatt@apks.com
(202) 942-5000
Party name: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Lisa Marie English
    Counsel of Record
New Hampshire Attorney General's Office
33 Capitol Street
Concord, NH 03301

lisa.english@doj.nh.gov
603-271-3658
Party name: New Hampshire
Other
Laura Kathleen McNally
    Counsel of Record
Loeb & Loeb, LLP
321 N. Clark St.
Chicago, IL 60654

lmcnally@loeb.com
312-464-3155
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543