Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-619
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-619
Title:Paul Tanaka, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 26, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-50233)
   Decision Date:August 31, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 24 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 27, 2017)
Nov 01 2017Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Nov 08 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2017.
Dec 04 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Charles M Sevilla
    Counsel of Record
402 W. Broadway, #720
San Diego, CA 92101

chuck@charlessevilla.com
(619) 232-2222
Party name: Paul Tanaka
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543