Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-6117
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-6117
Title:Scott James Eizember, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 26, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1406)
   Decision Date:June 27, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 22 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 26, 2017)
Oct 04 2017Waiver of right of respondents United States to respond filed.
Oct 12 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017.
Oct 17 2017Response Requested. (Due November 16, 2017)
Nov 16 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 16, 2017 to December 18, 2017, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 17 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 18, 2017.
Dec 18 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 04 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2018.
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Sessions v. Dimaya, 584 U. S. ____ (2018).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Anna M. Williams
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
3739 Steele Blvd.
Suite 280
Fayetteville, AR 72703

anna_williams@fd.org
(479) 442-2306
Party name: Scott Eizember
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543