Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-6065
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-6065
Title:Ramon Hernandez-Ramirez, aka Ramon Hernandez, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 20, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-41253)
   Decision Date:July 19, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:August 23, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 18 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 20, 2017)
Oct 12 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 20, 2017.
Oct 30 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including December 7, 2017.
Dec 07 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 13 2017Reply of petitioner Ramon Hernandez-Ramirez filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Dec 21 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Sessions v. Dimaya, 584 U. S. ____ (2018).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Marjorie A. Meyers
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defender's Office440 Louisiana StreetSuite 1350
Houston, TX 77002-1669

(713) 718-4600
Party name: Ramon Hernandez-Ramirez
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543