Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-5965
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-5965
Title:Rasheen Weston, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 14, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-4744)
   Decision Date:March 9, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:June 20, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 12 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 16, 2017)
Sep 27 2017Waiver of right of respondents United States to respond filed.
Oct 05 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017.
Oct 10 2017Response Requested. (Due November 9, 2017)
Nov 02 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 11, 2017.
Dec 04 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 11, 2017 to January 10, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 05 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 10, 2018.
Jan 08 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 10, 2018 to February 9, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 08 2018Motion of United States for an extension of time not accepted for filing. (January 09, 2018)
Jan 09 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 9, 2018.
Feb 09 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 26 2018Reply of petitioner Rasheen Weston filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018.
Apr 02 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kimberly H. Albro
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
1901 Assembly Street, Suite 200
Columbia, SC 29201

kimberly_albro@fd.org
(803) 765-5088
Party name: Rasheen Weston
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543