Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-5940 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-5940 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Michael Sample, Petitioner
v.
Tennessee
Docketed:September 12, 2017
Linked with 17A27
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Tennessee, Western Division
   Case Numbers:(W2016-02325-CCA-R28-PD)
   Decision Date:December 29, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:April 13, 2017
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 29 2017Application (17A27) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 12, 2017 to September 10, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Jul 06 2017Application (17A27) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until September 10, 2017.
Sep 08 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 12, 2017)
Oct 11 2017Brief of respondent Tennessee in opposition filed.
Oct 20 2017Reply of petitioner Michael Eugene Sample filed.
Oct 25 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2017.
Nov 13 2017Petition DENIED.
Dec 08 2017Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main Document
Dec 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Jan 08 2018Rehearing DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul Rudolph Bottei
    Counsel of Record
Middle District of Tennessee
810 Broadway, Suite 200
Nashville, TN 37203

615-736-5047
Party name: Michael Eugene Sample
Attorneys for Respondent
James E. Gaylord
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202

(615) 741-3491
Party name: Tennessee

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543