Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-593
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-593
Title:Jared D. Herrmann, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 20, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(16-0599)
   Decision Date:June 19, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:July 13, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 11 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 20, 2017)
Oct 26 2017Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Nov 01 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/21/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John N. Maher
    Counsel of Record
Maher Legal Service PC
7 East Main Street
Number 1053
St. Charles, IL 60174

johnmaher@maherlegalservices.com
(708) 468-8155
Party name: Jared Herrmann
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543