Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-591
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-591
Vide 17-578, 17-580
Title:Fairholme Funds, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Federal Housing Finance Agency, et al.
Docketed:October 20, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-5243, 14-5254, 14-5260, 14-5262)
   Decision Date:July 17, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 16 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 20, 2017)
Nov 15 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 20, 2017 to December 20, 2017, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 16 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 20, 2017.
Nov 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of Investors Unite filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 17 2017Brief amici curiae of Louise Rafter, Josephine and Stephen Rattien, and Pershing Square Capital Management, L.P. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 17 2017Waiver of right of respondents Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 17 2017Waiver of right of respondent Fannie Mae to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 11 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 20, 2017 to January 17, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 12 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 17, 2018.
Jan 17 2018Brief of Federal Respondents in opposition filed. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 30 2018Reply of petitioners Fairholme Funds, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 20 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Charles Justin Cooper
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

ccooper@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: Fairholme Funds, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jonathan D. Hacker
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

jhacker@omm.com
202-383-5300
Party name: Fannie Mae
Edwin Smiley Kneedler
    Counsel of Record
D.O.J.
10th & Constitution Ave
Washington, DC 20530

Judith.L.Reardon-Bridges@usdoj.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Respondents
Merritt Ellen McAlister
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
1180 Peachtree St NE
Atlanta, GA 30309

mmcalister@kslaw.com
404-572-2752
Party name: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Other
Michael A. Carvin
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

macarvin@jonesday.com
(202) 879-7643
Party name: Louise Rafter, Josephine and Stephen Rattien, and Pershing Square Capital Management, L.P.
Michael Hugh Krimminger
    Counsel of Record
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

mkrimminger@cgsh.com
202-974-1500
Party name: Investors Unite

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543