Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-5876
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-5876
Title:Earnest Earl Matthews, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 7, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-2298)
   Decision Date:May 8, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:June 8, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 05 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 10, 2017)
Sep 18 2017Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Sep 21 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017.
Oct 02 2017Rescheduled.
Mar 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018.
Apr 02 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Steven Richard Jaeger
    Counsel of Record
23 Erlanger Road
Erlanger, KY 41018

srjaeger@thejaegerfirm.com
(859)-342-4500
Party name: Earnest Matthews
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543