Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-586
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-586
Vide 17-626
Title:Greg Abbott, Governor of Texas, et al., Appellants
v.
Shannon Perez, et al.
Docketed:October 19, 2017
Linked with 17A825
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Western District of Texas
   Case Numbers:(SA-11-CV-360)
   Decision Date:August 15, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 17 2017Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due November 20, 2017)
Oct 17 2017Appendix of Greg Abbott, Governor of Texas, et al. filed.
Nov 20 2017Motion to dismiss or affirm and supplemental appendix filed by appellees Eddie Rodriguez, et al.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2017Brief amici curiae of States of Louisiana, Alabama, Michigan, Missouri, Ohio, South Carolina, and Wisconsin filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 04 2017Reply of appellants Greg Abbott, Governor of Texas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Jan 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018.
Jan 12 2018Further consideration of the question of jurisdiction is POSTPONED to the hearing of the case on the merits. Further consideration of the question of jurisdiction in No. 17-626 is postponed to the hearing of the case on the merits. The cases are consolidated and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument.
Jan 12 2018Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 17-586. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 17-586. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the flings is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Jan 30 2018Joint motion for divided argument and enlargement of time for oral argument filed by appellees. VIDED
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 31 2018Joint Blanket Consent filed by appellees, Shannon Perez, et al., and appellees, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, filed. VIDED
Blanket Consent
Feb 01 2018Blanket Consent filed by appellants, Greg Abbott, Governor of Texas, et al. VIDED
Blanket Consent
Feb 02 2018Application (17A825) for leave to file appellants' brief on the merits and the reply brief on the merits in excess of the word limits, submitted to Justice Alito. VIDED
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 06 2018Application (17A825) granted by Justice Alito for leave to file appellants' brief on the merits and the reply brief on the merits in excess of the word limits. VIDED
Feb 23 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, April 24, 2018. VIDED
Feb 26 2018Joint appendix filed. VIDED
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 26 2018Brief of appellants Greg Abbott, Governor of Texas, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2018Brief of appellee United States in support of appellants filed. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 05 2018Brief amici curiae of States of Louisiana, Alabama, Michigan, Missouri, Ohio, South Carolina, and Wisconsin filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 07 2018CIRCULATED
Mar 23 2018Motion for divided argument filed by the Solicitor General. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 28 2018Brief of appellees Perez, et al. (State House Districts) filed (No. 17-626). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2018Brief of appellees Perez, et al. (Congressional Districts) filed (No. 17-586). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 04 2018Brief amici curiae of Common Cause and The Voting Rights Institute filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 04 2018Brief amici curiae of Campaign Legal Center; Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law; NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 13 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for divided argument and the motion of appellees for enlargement of time for oral argument and for divided argument are granted, and the time is divided as follows: 25 minutes for appellants, 10 minutes for the Solicitor General in support of appellants, 15 minutes for appellees in No. 17-586, and 20 minutes for appellees in No. 17-626.
Apr 17 2018Reply of appellee United States in support of appellants filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Apr 17 2018Reply of appellants Greg Abbott, Governor of Texas, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 24 2018Argued. For appellants: Scott A. Keller, Solicitor General of Texas, Austin, Tex. For appellee United States in support of appellants: Edwin S. Kneedler, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For appellees in 17-586: Max Renea Hicks, Austin, Tex. For appellees in 17-626: Allison J. Riggs, Durham, N. C. VIDED
Jun 25 2018Judgment REVERSED, and case REMANDED. Alito, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Kennedy, Thomas, and Gorsuch, JJ., joined. Thomas, J., filed a concurring opinion, in which Gorsuch, J., joined. Sotomayor, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Ginsburg, Breyer, and Kagan, JJ., joined. VIDED. (No. 17-626, Judgment REVERSED IN PART, AFFIRMED IN PART, and case REMANDED).
Jul 27 2018JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Appellants
Scott A. Keller
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

scott.keller@oag.texas.gov
(512) 936-1700
Party name: Greg Abbott, Governor of Texas, et al.
Attorneys for Appellees
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Renea Hicks
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Max Renea Hicks
P.O. Box 303187
Austin, TX 78703

rhicks@renea-hicks.com
(512) 480-8231
Party name: Eddie Rodriguez, et al.
Pamela Susan Karlan
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

karlan@stanford.edu
650-725-4851
Party name: Mexican American Legislative Caucus
Other
Danielle Marie Lang
    Counsel of Record
Campaign Legal Center
1411 K Street NW Suite 1400
Washington, DC 20005

dlang@campaignlegalcenter.org
2027362200
Party name: Campaign Legal Center; Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law; NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
Elizabeth Baker Murrill
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Louisiana Attorney General
P.O. Box 94005
Baton Rouge, LA 70084-9005

murrille@ag.louisiana.gov
225-326-6766
Party name: States of Louisiana, Alabama, Michigan, Missouri, Ohio, South Carolina, and Wisconsin
Charles Rothfeld
    Counsel of Record
Mayer, Brown, Rowe & Maw LLP
190 South LaSalle Street
Chicago, IL 60603

crothfeld@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3233
Party name: Common Cause and The Voting Rights Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543