Docket for 17-58
|
Apr 28 2017 | Application (16A1054) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 8, 2017 to June 7, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | | May 01 2017 | Application (16A1054) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until June 7, 2017. | | | May 23 2017 | Application (16A1054) to extend further the time from June 7, 2017 to July 7, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | | May 24 2017 | Application (16A1054) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 7, 2017. | | | Jul 07 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 10, 2017) | | | Jul 31 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 11, 2007. | | | Sep 11 2017 | Brief of respondent Rafael A. Larios-Reyes in opposition filed. | | | Sep 26 2017 | Reply of petitioner Jefferson B. Sessions III, Attorney General filed. | | | Sep 27 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017. | | | Oct 16 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|