Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-5767
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-5767
Title:Xing Lin, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 30, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-4133)
   Decision Date:March 20, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:May 31, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 28 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 29, 2017)
Sep 21 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 30, 2017.
Oct 30 2017Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Nov 15 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2017.
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Sessions v. Dimaya, 584 U. S. ____ (2018).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Megan Wolfe Benett
    Counsel of Record
750 Third Avenue, 32nd Floor
New York, NY 10017

mbenett@kreindler.com
(212) 973-3406
Party name: Xing Lin
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543