Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-5745
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-5745
Title:John Terry Phelps, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 28, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-10684)
   Decision Date:May 26, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 24 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 27, 2017)
Sep 07 2017Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Sep 14 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017.
Sep 14 2017Supplemental brief of petitioner John T. Phelps filed. (Distributed)
Sep 22 2017Rescheduled.
Mar 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 14 2018Response Requested. (Due April 13, 2018)
Apr 05 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 13, 2018 to May 14, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 14, 2018
May 14 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
May 30 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Adam Labonte
    Counsel of Record
400 N. Tampa Street
Suite 2700
Tampa, FL 33602

Adam_Labonte@fd.org
813-228-2715
Party name: John T. Phelps
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. FranciscoSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543