Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-5716
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-5716
Title:Timothy D. Koons, Kenneth Jay Putensen, Randy Feauto, Esequiel Gutierrez, and Jose Manuel Gardea, Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:August 24, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-3794, 15-3825, 15-3854, 15-3800, 15-3894)
   Decision Date:March 10, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:May 25, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 22 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 25, 2017)
Sep 21 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 25, 2017.
Oct 25 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Nov 09 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2017.
Dec 04 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2017.
Dec 08 2017Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
James Whalen
    Counsel of Record
Capital Square, Suite 340
400 Locust St.
Des Moines, IA 50309-2360

(515) 309-9610
Party name: Timothy D. Koons, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. FranciscoSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543