Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-571
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-571
Title:Fourth Estate Public Benefit Corporation, Petitioner
v.
Wall-Street.com, LLC, et al.
Docketed:October 16, 2017
Linked with 17A150
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-13726)
   Decision Date:May 18, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 04 2017Application (17A150) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 16, 2017 to October 13, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Aug 07 2017Application (17A150) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until October 13, 2017.
Oct 13 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 15, 2017)
Oct 13 2017Waiver of right of respondents Wall-Street.com, LLC, et al. to respond filed.
Nov 01 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/21/2017.
Nov 02 2017Response Requested. (Due December 4, 2017)
Nov 28 2017Brief of respondents Wall-Street.com, LLC, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 13 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Dec 13 2017Reply of petitioner Fourth Estate Public Benefit Corporation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 08 2018The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
May 16 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jun 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 05 2018Supplemental brief of petitioner Fourth Estate Pub. Benefit Corp. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2018.
Jun 28 2018Petition GRANTED.
Jul 23 2018Motion for an extension of time filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 24 2018Blanket Consent received from counsel of record for Petitioner, Fourth Estate Public Benefit Corporation filed.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Jul 24 2018Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Fourth Estate Pub. Benefit Corp.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 25 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, Wall-Street.com, LLC, et al.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Jul 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file the opening briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 27, 2018. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including October 11, 2018.
Aug 24 2018Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Aug 27 2018Brief of petitioner Fourth Estate Pub. Benefit Corp. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 04 2018Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 04 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Copyright Alliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 04 2018Brief amici curiae of National Music Publishers' Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 04 2018Brief amici curiae of Authors Guild and Other Artists' Rights Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 04 2018Brief amicus curiae of The International Trademark Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Aaron M. Panner
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, PLLC
1615 M Street, NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

apanner@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7900
Party name: Fourth Estate Pub. Benefit Corp.
Attorneys for Respondents
Peter K. Stris
    Counsel of Record
Stris & Maher LLP
725 S. Figueroa St., Ste. 1830
Los Angeles, CA 90017

peter.stris@strismaher.com
(213) 995-6801
Party name: Wall-Street.com, LLC, et al.
Other
Robert M. Carlson
    Counsel of Record
Corette Pohlman, et al.
129 W. Park
Butte, MT 59701

annaliese.fleming@americanbar.org
312-988-5000
Party name: AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Beth Susan Brinkmann
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001-4956

bbrinkmann@cov.com
202-662-5312
Party name: National Music Publishers' Association; Recording Industry Association of America; American Society of Composers, Authors and Publishers; Broadcast Music, Inc.; Nashville Songwriters Association International; Songwriters of North America
Eleanor Martine Lackman
    Counsel of Record
Cowan DeBaets Abrahams & Sheppard LLP
41 Madison Avenue, 38th Floor
New York, NY 10010

Elackman@cdas.com
212-974-7474
Party name: Authors Guild and Other Artists' Rights Organizations
Lawrence K. Nodine
    Counsel of Record
Ballard Spahr, LLP
999 Peachtree St., Suite 1000
Atlanta, GA 30309

nodinel@ballardspahr.com
(678) 420-9422
Party name: THE INTERNATIONAL TRADEMARK ASSOCIATION
John Matthew DeWeese Williams
    Counsel of Record
Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP
1818 N. Street NW, 8th Floor
Washington, DC 20036

mxw@msk.com
202-355-7900
Party name: The Copyright Alliance

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543