Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-564
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-564
Title:NOVA Chemicals Corporation (Canada), et al., Petitioners
v.
Dow Chemical Company
Docketed:October 16, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2016-1576)
   Decision Date:May 11, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:August 11, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 13 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 15, 2017)
Oct 20 2017Waiver of right of respondent Dow Chemical Co. to respond filed.
Nov 01 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/21/2017.
Nov 27 2017Petition DENIED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

seth.waxman@wilmerhale.com
(202) 663-6000
Party name: NOVA Chemicals Corp., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Kathleen Marie Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
51 Madison Ave., 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10010

kathleensullivan@quinnemanuel.com
(212) 849-7000
Party name: Dow Chemical Co.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543