Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-5622 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-5622 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Dennis Wade Suttles, Petitioner
v.
Tennessee
Docketed:August 16, 2017
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Tennessee, Eastern Division
   Case Numbers:(E2016-02162-CCA-R28-PD)
   Decision Date:February 13, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:May 18, 2017
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 14 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 15, 2017)
Sep 15 2017Brief of respondent Tennessee in opposition filed.
Oct 05 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017.
Oct 30 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel Evan Kirsch
    Counsel of Record
P.O. Box 198068
Nashville, TN 37219-8068

kirschd@tnpcdo.net
615-741-9331
Party name: Dennis Wade Suttles
Attorneys for Respondent
James E. Gaylord
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202

(615) 741-3491
Party name: Tennessee

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543