Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-5592 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-5592 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Donald Ray Middlebrooks, Petitioner
v.
Tony Mays, Acting Warden
Docketed:August 14, 2017
Linked with 16A1198
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-6061)
   Decision Date:December 19, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:March 14, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 01 2017Application (16A1198) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 12, 2017 to August 11, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Aug 03 2017Application (16A1198) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until August 11, 2017.
Aug 10 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 13, 2017)
Sep 13 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 13, 2017.
Oct 27 2017Brief of respondent Tony Mays in opposition filed.
Nov 13 2017Reply of petitioner Donald Middlebrooks filed.
Main Document
Nov 15 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2017.
Dec 04 2017Petition DENIED.
Dec 29 2017Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 10 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Jan 24 2018Supplemental brief to petition for rehearing filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 14 2018Motion to Reschedule Or Defer Consideration Of Petition For Rehearing filed by petitioner Donald Middlebrooks. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 20 2018Rehearing DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul Rudolph Bottei
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
Middle District of Tennessee
810 Broadway, Suite 200
Nashville, TN 37203

615-736-5047
Party name: Donald Middlebrooks
Attorneys for Respondent
Jennifer L. Smith
    Counsel of Record
Associate Solicitor General
P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202-0207

(615) 741-3487
Party name: Tony Mays

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543