Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-5554
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-5554
Title:Denard Stokeling, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 9, 2017
Linked with 16A1211
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-12951)
   Decision Date:April 6, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 06 2017Application (16A1211) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 5, 2017 to August 4, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Jun 12 2017Application (16A1211) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until August 4, 2017.
Aug 04 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 8, 2017)
Aug 16 2017Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Aug 24 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Aug 29 2017Supplemental brief of petitioner Denard Stokeling filed. (Distributed)
Aug 31 2017Second supplemental brief of petitioner Denard Stokeling filed. (Distributed)
Sep 12 2017Response Requested. (Due October 12, 2017)
Oct 04 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 13, 2017.
Nov 08 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including December 13, 2017.
Dec 13 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 27 2017Reply of petitioner Denard Stokeling filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 07 2018Third supplemental brief of petitioner Denard Stokeling filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 19 2018Fourth supplemental brief of petitioner Denard Stokeling filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018.
Apr 02 2018Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED.
Apr 24 2018Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits is granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including June 11, 2018. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 3, 2018.
Apr 24 2018Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jun 11 2018Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 11 2018Brief of petitioner Denard Stokeling filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 18 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 09 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT On Tuesday, October 9, 2018
Aug 03 2018CIRCULATED
Aug 03 2018Brief of respondent United States filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 07 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit.
Aug 07 2018Record received from the U.S.D.C. Southern Dist. of FL. (Miami). The record is electronic.
Aug 14 2018Record received from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of Florida. 1 envelope, the record is SEALED.
Sep 04 2018Reply of petitioner Denard Stokeling filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 09 2018Argued. For petitioner: Brenda G. Bryn, Ft. Lauderdale, Fla. For respondent: Frederick Liu, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brenda G. Bryn
    Counsel of Record
1 East Broward Boulevard, Suite 1100
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301-1100

brenda_bryn@fd.org
(954) 356-7436
Party name: Denard Stokeling
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. FranciscoSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Hyland Hunt
    Counsel of Record
Deutsch Hunt PLLC
300 New Jersey Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

hhunt@deutschhunt.com
2028686915
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543