Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-5543
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-5543
Title:James Lee Davis, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 10, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-10924-B)
   Decision Date:May 10, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 08 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 11, 2017)
Aug 18 2017Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Aug 24 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Sep 14 2017Rescheduled.
Sep 19 2017Supplemental brief of petitioner James Davis filed.
Mar 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 14 2018Response Requested. (Due April 13, 2018)
Apr 05 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 13, 2018 to May 14, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 14, 2018
May 14 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
May 24 2018Reply of petitioner James Davis filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 30 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michelle Rachel Yard
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defender's Office
201 South Orange Avenue
Suite 300
Orlando, FL 32801

Michelle_Yard@fd.org
(407) 648-6338
Party name: James Davis
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. FranciscoSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543