Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-5539 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
No. 17-5539 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Cary Michael Lambrix, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:August 9, 2017
Linked with 17A368
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Florida
   Case Numbers:(SC16-8)
   Decision Date:March 9, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:May 10, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 07 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 8, 2017)
Sep 07 2017Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed.
Sep 21 2017Reply of petitioner Cary Lambrix filed.
Oct 03 2017Application (17A368) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Oct 03 2017Response to application from respondent Florida filed.
Oct 05 2017Application (17A368) referred to the Court.
Oct 05 2017Petition DENIED.
Oct 05 2017Application (17A368) denied by the Court.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William McKinley Hennis
    Counsel of Record
1 East Broward Blvd
Suite 444
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

(954) 713-1284
Party name: Cary Lambrix
Attorneys for Respondent
Scott Andrew Browne
    Counsel of Record
3507 E. Frontage Road, Suite 200
Tampa, FL 33607-7013

Scott.Browne@MyFloridaLegal.com
(813) 287-7108
Party name: Florida

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543