Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-5495
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-5495
Title:Stacy Winters, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 4, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-3902)
   Decision Date:June 20, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 02 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 5, 2017)
Aug 30 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 5, 2017.
Sep 21 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 6, 2017.
Nov 06 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Nov 21 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2017.
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Sessions v. Dimaya, 584 U. S. ____ (2018).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Neil Fulton
    Counsel of Record
101 South Pierre Street, Third Floor
Pierre, SD 57501

(605) 224-0009
Party name: Stacy Winters
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. FranciscoSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543