Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-5476
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-5476
Title:Omar Orlando Rodriguez, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 3, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-40041)
   Decision Date:July 13, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 31 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 5, 2017)
Aug 30 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 5, 2017.
Oct 05 2017Memorandum of respondent United States in oppsition filed.
Oct 11 2017Letter received 10-17-2017 from counsel petitioner. Distributed
Oct 19 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/3/2017.
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gregory Sherwood
    Counsel of Record
P.O. Box 200613
Austin, TX 78720-0613

gsherwood@mail.com
(512) 484-9029
Party name: Omar Orlando Rodriguez
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543