Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-5454
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-5454
Title:Edward J. Reinhart, Petitioner
v.
Citimortgage, Inc., et al.
Docketed:August 1, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1918)
   Decision Date:February 15, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 15 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 31, 2017)
Aug 07 2017Waiver of right of respondents Citimortgage, Inc., et al. to respond filed.
Aug 08 2017Waiver of right of respondents Virginia Grapensteter, et al. to respond filed.
Sep 14 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017.
Oct 10 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Edward J. Reinhart
    Counsel of Record
698 County Route 353
Rensselaerville, NY 12147

Party name: Edward J. Reinhart
Attorneys for Respondents
Lijue Thomas Philip
    Counsel of Record
51 East Bethpage Road
Plainview, NY 11803

Lijue.Philip@gmail.com
516-741-2585
Party name: Virginia Grapensteter, et al.
Jordan M. Smith
    Counsel of Record
666 Fifth Avenue, 20th Floor
New York, NY 10103

Jordan.Smith@ackerman.com
212-905-6447
Party name: Citimortgage, Inc., et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543