Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-5410
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-5410
Title:Willie Tyler, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:July 28, 2017
Linked with 16A1084
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-4220)
   Decision Date:January 6, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:February 27, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 27 2017Application (16A1084) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 28, 2017 to July 27, 2017, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. (Justice Alito is recused.)
May 10 2017Application (16A1084) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until July 27, 2017.
Jul 27 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 28, 2017)
Aug 04 2017Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Aug 15 2017Brief amicus curiae of Law Professors filed. (Distributed)
Aug 17 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Aug 22 2017Response Requested. (Due September 21, 2017)
Aug 28 2017Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center, et al. filed.
Sep 15 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 23, 2017.
Sep 21 2017Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Oct 19 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 22, 2017.
Nov 22 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 06 2017Reply of petitioner WillieTyler filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 07 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Jan 03 2018Rescheduled.
Mar 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.
May 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/24/2018.
May 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/31/2018.
Jun 04 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
Jun 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ronald A. Krauss
    Counsel of Record
100 Chestnut Street
Suite 306
Harrisburg, PA 17101

ronald_krauss@fd.org
717-782-2237
Party name: Willie Tyler
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Stuart Banner
    Counsel of Record
UCLA School of Law, Supreme Court Clinic405 Hilgard Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90095

banner@law.ucla.edu
3102068506
Party name: Law Professors
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW, Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202-296-6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center, et al.
Jonathan L. Marcus
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom, LLP
1440 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

jonathan.marcus@skadden.com
202-371-7000
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543