Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-531
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-531
Title:Oak Harbor Freight Lines, Inc., Petitioner
v.
National Labor Relations Board
Docketed:October 10, 2017
Linked with 17A719
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-1226)
   Decision Date:May 2, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:July 7, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 04 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 9, 2017)
Oct 23 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 11, 2017, for all respondents.
Dec 06 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 11, 2017 to January 10, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 07 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 10, 2018, for all respondents.
Dec 11 2017Brief of respondents Intervenors Teamsters Locals 81, 174, 231, 252, 324, 483, 589, 690, 760, 763, 839, and 962 in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 03 2018Application (17A719) for a stay pending the disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 10 2018Brief of respondent NLRB in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 22 2018Reply of petitioner Oak Harbor Freight Lines filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 23 2018Application (17A719) denied by The Chief Justice.
Jan 24 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 20 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Selena Clare Smith
    Counsel of Record
701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 4040
Seattle, WA 98104

ssmith@davisgrimmpayne.com
206-447-0182
Party name: Oak Harbor Freight Lines
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: NLRB
Thomas Anthony Leahy
    Counsel of Record
Reid, McCarthy, Ballew & Leahy, LLP
100 West Harrison Street, North Tower, Suite 300
Seattle, WA 98119

Tom@rmbllaw.com
206-285-3610
Party name: Intervenors Teamsters Locals 81, 174, 231, 252, 324, 483, 589, 690, 760, 763, 839, and 962

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543