Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-5305
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-5305
Title:Rolando Daniel Garcia-Hernandez, aka Rolando Daniel-Garcia, aka Rolando Daniel Hernandez Garcia, aka Rolando Hernandez-Garcia, aka Rolando Daniel H. Garcia, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:July 24, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-20631)
   Decision Date:May 3, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 20 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 23, 2017)
Aug 16 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 22, 2017.
Sep 22 2017Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Sep 29 2017Reply of petitioner Rolando D. Garcia-Hernandez filed.
Oct 05 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017.
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Sessions v. Dimaya, 584 U. S. ____ (2018).
Jun 15 2018JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kayla Gassmann
    Counsel of Record
440 Louisiana, Suite 1350
Houston, TX 77002-1669

kayla_gassmann@fd.org
(713) 718-4600
Party name: Rolando D.Garcia-Hernandez
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543