Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-530
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-530
Title:Wisconsin Central Ltd., et al., Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:October 10, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-3300, 16-3303, 16-3304)
   Decision Date:May 8, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:July 12, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 06 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 9, 2017)
Oct 26 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 11, 2017.
Nov 09 2017Brief amicus curiae of Association of American Railroads filed.
Dec 06 2017Brief of respondent United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Dec 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Jan 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018.
Jan 12 2018Petition GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Thomas Henderson Dupree Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20036

(202) 955-8500
Party name: Wisconsin Central Ltd., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Daniel Saphire
    Counsel of Record
Association of American Railroads, 425 3rd Street. N.W.
`
Washington, DC 20024

dsaphire@aar.org
202-639-2505
Party name: Association of American Railroads

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543