Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-5283
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-5283
Title:Adrian Gomez-Ureaba and Silvano Garcia-Ibarra, Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:July 21, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-10670, 15-10870)
   Decision Date:April 18, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 17 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 21, 2017)
Aug 16 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 20, 2017.
Sep 20 2017Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Oct 05 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017.
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Sessions v. Dimaya, 584 U. S. ____ (2018).
Jun 15 2018JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
J. Matthew WrightFederal Public Defender's Office
Northern District of Texas
500 South Taylor Street, Suite 110
Amarillo, TX 79101

matthew_wright@fd.org
(806) 324-2370
Party name: Adrian Gomez-Ureaba and Silvano Garcia-Ibarra
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543