Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-528
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-528
Title:Jennifer Strang, Petitioner
v.
Ford Motor Company General Retirement Plan, et al.
Docketed:October 10, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-2090)
   Decision Date:May 19, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:July 7, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 05 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 9, 2017)
Oct 30 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 11, 2017.
Dec 11 2017Brief of respondents Ford Motor Company General Retirement Plan, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2017Reply of petitioner Jennifer Strang filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2018.
Jan 22 2018The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
May 22 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jun 01 2018Supplemental brief of petitioner Jennifer Strang filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 25 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew W.H. Wessler
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
1900 L Street, NW
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20036

matt@guptawessler.com
2028881741
Party name: Jennifer Strang
Robert Brown JuneLaw Offices of Robert June, P.C.
415 Detroit Street, 2nd Floor
Ann Arbor, MI 48104-1117

bobjune@junelaw.com
(734) 481-1000
Party name: Jennifer Strang
Attorneys for Respondents
Eugene Scalia
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036-5306

escalia@gibsondunn.com
(202)-955-8206
Party name: Ford Motor Company General Retirement Plan, et al.
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543