Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-5153 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-5153 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Cary Michael Lambrix, Petitioner
v.
Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections
Docketed:July 12, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-10251)
   Decision Date:March 15, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:April 12, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 10 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 11, 2017)
Aug 09 2017Brief of respondent Jones, Sec., FL DOC in opposition filed.
Aug 22 2017Reply of petitioner Cary M.Lambrix filed. (Distributed)
Aug 24 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Oct 02 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William McKinley Hennis III.
    Counsel of Record
Capital Collateral Regional Counsel-South
1 East Broward Blvd
Ste. 444
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

hennisw@ccsr.state.fl.us
(954) 713-1284
Party name: Cary Michael Lambrix
William McKinley Hennis II
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Capitol Collateral Regional Counsel - South
1 East Broward Blvd., Suite 444
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

(954) 713-1284
Party name: Cary M.Lambrix
Attorneys for Respondent
Candance M. Sabella
    Counsel of Record
3507 East Frontage Road
Suite 200
Tampa, FL 33607

candance.sabella@myfloridallegal.com
813-287-7910
Party name: Jones, Sec., FL DOC

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543