Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-5152
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-5152
Title:Jonathon Adam Lamb, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:July 12, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-2399)
   Decision Date:February 3, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:April 12, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 10 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 11, 2017)
Jul 19 2017Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Jul 27 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Sep 14 2017Rescheduled.
Mar 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018.
Apr 02 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Heather Rae Quick
    Counsel of Record
222 Third Avenue SE
Suite 290
Cedar Rapids, IA 52401

heather_quick@fd.org
319-363-9540
Party name: Jonathon Adam Lamb
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543