Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-5083 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-5083 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Terence Oliver, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:July 5, 2017
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Florida
   Case Numbers:(SC12-1350)
   Decision Date:April 6, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 28 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 4, 2017)
Aug 04 2017Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed.
Aug 24 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Oct 02 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017.
Oct 10 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017.
Oct 16 2017Petition DENIED. Justice Breyer, dissenting from the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion). Justice Sotomayor, with whom Justice Ginsburg and Justice Breyer join, dissenting from the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Nancy Ryan
    Counsel of Record
Assistant Public Defender
444 Seabreeze Blvd.
Suite 210
Daytona Beach, FL 32118

(386) 254-3758
Party name: Terence Oliver
Attorneys for Respondent
Vivian Ann Singleton
    Counsel of Record
444 Seabreeze Boulevard, 5th Floor
Daytona Beach, FL 32118-3951

Vivian.Singleton@myfloridalegal.com
386-238-4990
Party name: Florida

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543