Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-508
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-508
Title:Rivka Livnat, Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ben-Yosef Livnat, et al., Petitioners
v.
Palestinian Authority, aka The Palestinian Interim Self-Government Authority
Docketed:October 4, 2017
Linked with 17A100
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-7024, 15-7025)
   Decision Date:March 24, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:May 16, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 19 2017Application (17A100) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 14, 2017 to September 28, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Jul 24 2017Application (17A100) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 28, 2017.
Sep 28 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 3, 2017)
Oct 06 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 18, 2017.
Dec 08 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 17, 2018.
Dec 08 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 18, 2017 to January 17, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 08 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 16, 2018.
Jan 08 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 17, 2018 to March 16, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 02 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 14, 2018.
Mar 02 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 16, 2018 to May 14, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including June 13, 2018.
Apr 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 14, 2018 to June 13, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 13 2018Brief of respondent Palestinian Authority in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 14 2018Supplemental brief of petitioners Rivka Livnat, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 21 2018Rescheduled.
Oct 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.
Oct 02 2018Rescheduled.
Oct 05 2018Letter of petitioners Rivka Livnat, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Oct 05 2018Supplemental brief of respondent Palestinian Authority filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 09 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.
Oct 15 2018Petition DENIED. Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Andrew Levy
    Counsel of Record
Brown, Goldstein & Levy, LLP
120 E. Baltimore St., Suite 1700
Baltimore, MD 21202

(410) 962-1030
Party name: Rivka Livnat, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Gassan A. Baloul
    Counsel of Record
Squire Patton Boggs
2550 M Street, NW
Washington, DC 20037

gassan.baloul@squirepb.com
(202) 457-6000
Party name: Palestinian Authority

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543