Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-5018
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-5018
Title:Steven Klikno, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 27, 2017
Linked with 16A1062
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-2312)
   Decision Date:January 9, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:February 8, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 27 2017Application (16A1062) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 9, 2017 to July 8, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan.
May 02 2017Application (16A1062) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until July 8, 2017.
Jun 22 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 27, 2017)
Jul 05 2017Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Jul 13 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Sep 14 2017Rescheduled.
Jan 17 2018Supplemental brief of petitioner Steven Klikno filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 06 2018Response Requested. (Due April 5, 2018)
Mar 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 5, 2018 to May 7, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 28 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 7, 2018.
May 07 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
May 30 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Dec 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED in light of Stokeling v. United States, 586 U. S. ___ (2019).
Mar 29 2019JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William H. Theis Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defender Program
55 E. Monroe St.
Suite 2800
Chicago, IL 60603

william_theis@fd.org
312.621.8300
Party name: Steven Klikno
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543