Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-465
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-465
Title:People for the Ethical Treatment of Property Owners, Petitioner
v.
United States Fish and Wildlife Service, et al.
Docketed:September 28, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-4151, 14-4165)
   Decision Date:March 29, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:August 8, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 26 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 30, 2017)
Oct 03 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, People for the Ethical Treatment of Property Owners on 10/06/2017
Oct 25 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 29, 2017, for all respondents.
Oct 27 2017Brief amici curiae of WY-MT Land Stewardship, LLC, et al. filed.
Oct 30 2017Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Oct 30 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Property and Environment Research Center.
Oct 30 2017Brief amici curiae of States of of Utah, et al. filed.
Oct 30 2017Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Oct 30 2017Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Home Builders filed.
Oct 30 2017Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Nov 29 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 29, 2017 to December 6, 2017, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 29 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including December 6, 2017, for all respondents.
Nov 29 2017Brief of respondent Intervenor, Friends of Animals in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2017Brief of respondent Federal Respondents in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Dec 18 2017Reply of petitioner Property Owners filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Jan 03 2018Letter dated January 3, 2018, of Federal Respondents received. (Distributed)
Main Document
Jan 08 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Property and Environment Research Center GRANTED.
Jan 08 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jonathan Calvin Wood
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
3033 Wilson Blvd., Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

jwood@pacificlegal.org
202-888-6881
Party name: Property Owners
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Respondents
Michael Ray Harris
    Counsel of Record
Friends of Animals Wildlife Law Program
7500 E. Arapahoe Road, Suite 385
Centennial, CO 80112

michaelharris@friendsofanimals.org
720-949-7791
Party name: Intervenor, Friends of Animals
Other
Karen Budd-Falen
    Counsel of Record
Budd-Falen Law Offices, LLC
300 East 18th Street, Post Office Box 346
Cheyenne, WY 82003-0346

karen@buddfalen.com
307-632-5105
Party name: WY-MT Land Stewardship, LLC, et al.
William Spencer Consovoy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy Park, PLLC
3033 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

will@consovoymccarthy.com
703-243-9423
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.
John C. Eastman
    Counsel of Record
c/o Fowler School of Law Chapman University
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

jeastman@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Tyler Green
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General, 350 N. State Street, Suite 230
Salt Lake City, UT 84114-2320

tylergreen@agutah.gov
(801-538-9600
Party name: States of of Utah, et al.
John Joseph Park Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Strickland Brockington Lewis, LLP
1170 Peachtree Street NE
Suite 2200
Atlanta, GA 30309-7200

(678)-347-2208
Party name: Property and Environment Research Center
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
(202)-842-0200
Party name: Cato Institute, et al.
Thomas Jon Ward
    Counsel of Record
National Association of Home Builders, 1201 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

tward@nahb.org
202-266-8200
Party name: National Association of Home Builders

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543