Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results

Docket for 17-463
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-463
Title:Kansas, et al., Petitioners
National Indian Gaming Commission, et al.
Docketed:September 28, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-3015)
   Decision Date:June 27, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 25 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 30, 2017)
Oct 27 2017Waiver of right of respondents National Indian Gaming Commission, et al. to respond filed.
Oct 30 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 6, 2017, for all respondents.
Nov 01 2017Waiver of right of respondent The Quapaw Tribe respondents to respond filed.
Nov 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2017.
Dec 11 2017Petition DENIED.

Attorneys for Petitioners
Stephen R. McAllister
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General of Kansas
120 S.W. 10th Ave 2nd floor
Topeka, KS 66612
(785) 296 2215
Party name: Kansas, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
Party name: National Indian Gaming Commission, et al.
Stephen R. Ward
    Counsel of Record
Conner & Winters
4000 One Williams Center
Tulsa, OK 74172-0148
(918) 586-5711
Party name: The Quapaw Tribe respondents


SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543