Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-447
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-447
Title:Window Rock Unified School District, Petitioner
v.
Ann Reeves, et al.
Docketed:September 25, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(13-16259, 13-16278)
   Decision Date:August 3, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 25 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 25, 2017)
Oct 23 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 24, 2017, for all respondents.
Oct 25 2017Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by National School Boards Association, et al.
Oct 25 2017Brief amicus curiae of Arizona filed.
Nov 15 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including December 8, 2017, for all respondents.
Dec 08 2017Brief of respondents Richie Nez, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 19 2017Reply of petitioner Window Rock Unified School District filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Jan 08 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by National School Boards Association, et al. GRANTED.
Jan 08 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eileen Dennis Gilbride
    Counsel of Record
Jones, Skelton & Hochuli, P.L.C.
40 North Central Ave., Suite 2700
Phoenix, AZ 85004

egilbride@jshfirm.com
(602) 263-1700
Party name: Window Rock Unified School District
Attorneys for Respondents
Paul Wesley Spruhan
    Counsel of Record
Navajo Nation Department of Justice
P.O. Box 2010
Window Rock, Navajo Nation, AZ 86515

pspruhan@nndoj.org
928-871-6229
Party name: Richie Nez, et al.
Other
Rachel Bruner-Kaufman
    Counsel of Record
Pearce Durick, PLLC
314 E. Thayer Avenue
Bismarck, ND 58501

rbk@pearce-durick.com
701 223 2890
Party name: National School Boards Association and Arizona School Boards Association
David Robert Cole
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1275 West Washington Street
Phoenix, AZ 85007

solicitorgeneral@azag.gov
602 542 3333
Party name: Arizona

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543