Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-429
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-429
Title:Jessica Tavares, Petitioner
v.
Gene Whitehouse, et al.
Docketed:September 22, 2017
Linked with 17A60
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-15814)
   Decision Date:March 14, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:April 24, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 12 2017Application (17A60) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 23, 2017 to September 21, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Jul 14 2017Application (17A60) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until September 21, 2017.
Sep 21 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 23, 2017)
Oct 23 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Goldwater Institute filed.
Oct 26 2017Brief amicus curiae of Andrea M. Seielstad filed.
Nov 08 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2017.
Nov 16 2017Response Requested. (Due December 18, 2017)
Dec 04 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 18, 2017 to February 16, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 11 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 16, 2018.
Feb 16 2018Brief of respondents Gene Whitehouse, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2018Reply of petitioner Jessica Tavares filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Mar 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 26 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Anthony Scodro
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
71 South Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60606

mscodro@mayerbrown.com
(312) 782-0600
Party name: Jessica Tavares
Attorneys for Respondents
Elliot R. Peters
    Counsel of Record
Keker & Van Nest LLP
633 Battery Street
San Francisco, CA 94111

epeters@kvn.com
(415)-391-5400
Party name: Gene Whitehouse, et al.
Other
Joel David Bertocchi
    Counsel of Record
Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP
222 North LaSalle Street, Suite 300
Chicago, IL 60601-1081

gsperry@hinshawlaw.com
312 704 3000
Party name: Andrea M. Seielstad
Timothy Mason Sandefur
    Counsel of Record
Scharf-Norton Center for Constitutional Litigation at the Goldwater Institute
500 E. Coronado Road
Phoenix, AZ 85004

litigation@goldwaterinstitute.org
(602) 462-5000
Party name: Goldwater Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543