Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-425
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-425
Title:Shawn William Wass, Petitioner
v.
Idaho
Docketed:September 20, 2017
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Idaho
   Case Numbers:(43844, 43845)
   Decision Date:June 22, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 20 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 20, 2017)
Oct 03 2017Waiver of right of respondent Idaho to respond filed.
Oct 24 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2017.
Oct 25 2017Response Requested. (Due November 24, 2017)
Nov 16 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 23, 2018.
Jan 23 2018Brief of respondent State of Idaho in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 30 2018Reply of petitioner Shawn William Wass filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Jun 04 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
Jun 05 2018Supplemental brief of petitioner Shawn William Wass filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 08 2018Record Requested.
Jun 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 11 2018Record received from the Supreme Court of Idaho. The record is electronic.
Jun 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2018.
Jun 28 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Amir H. Ali
    Counsel of Record
Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
718 7th St. NW
Washington, DC 20001

amir.ali@macarthurjustice.org
(202) 869-3434
Party name: Shawn William Wass
Attorneys for Respondent
Kenneth K. Jorgensen
    Counsel of Record
Off of Attny Gen - State of ID
Statehouse Room 210
P.O. Box 83720
Boise, ID 83720-0010

ken.jorgensen@ag.idaho.gov
208-332-3541
Party name: State of Idaho
John Charles McKinney
    Counsel of Record
Idaho Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 83720
Boise, ID 83720-0010

john.mckinney@ag.idaho.gov
208-332-3084
Party name: Idaho

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543