Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-423
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-423
Title:Richard Sterba, et ux., Petitioners
v.
PNC Bank
Docketed:September 20, 2017
Linked with 17A96
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-60061)
   Decision Date:April 5, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:May 19, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 19 2017Application (17A96) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 17, 2017 to September 16, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Jul 24 2017Application (17A96) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until September 16, 2017.
Sep 15 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 20, 2017)
Nov 08 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2017.
Nov 15 2017Response Requested. (Due December 15, 2017)
Dec 15 2017Brief of respondent PNC Bank, N.A. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2018.
Jan 22 2018The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Thomas Philip Kelly III
    Counsel of Record
50 Old Courthouse Square
Suite 609
Santa Rosa, CA 95404-4926

tomkelly@sonic.net
(707)-545-8700
Party name: Richard Sterba, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Miguel A. Estrada
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

mestrada@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8500
Party name: PNC Bank, N.A.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543