Docket for 17-41
|
Apr 18 2017 | Application (16A1023) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 4, 2017 to July 3, 2017, submitted to Justice Ginsburg. | | | Apr 24 2017 | Application (16A1023) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until July 3, 2017. | | | Jul 03 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 7, 2017) | | | Aug 02 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 6, 2017. | | | Sep 06 2017 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. | | | Sep 18 2017 | Reply of petitioner Jose Ismael Ventura filed. | | | Sep 20 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017. | | | Oct 10 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|