Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-365
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-365
Title:Kindred Hospitals East, LLC, dba Kindred Hospital Ocala, Petitioner
v.
Estate of Marianne Klemish, et al.
Docketed:September 11, 2017
Linked with 17A116
Lower Ct:District Court of Appeal of Florida, Fifth District
   Case Numbers:(5D15-2574)
   Decision Date:July 15, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:May 5, 2017
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 24 2017Application (17A116) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 3, 2017 to September 1, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Jul 27 2017Application (17A116) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until September 1, 2017.
Sep 01 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 11, 2017)
Sep 12 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 13, 2017.
Oct 11 2017Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States filed.
Nov 13 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 29, 2017.
Nov 27 2017Brief of respondents Estate of Marianne Klemish and Frank Klemish in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Dec 13 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Dec 13 2017Reply of petitioner Kindred Hospitals East, LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 08 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

(202) 263-3000
Party name: Kindred Hospitals East, LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Bryan S. Gowdy
    Counsel of Record
Creed & Gowdy, P.A.
865 May Street
Jacksonville, FL 32204

bgowdy@appellate-firm.com
9043500075
Party name: Estate of Marianne Klemish and Frank Klemish
Jessie L. Harrell
    Counsel of Record
Creed & Gowdy
865 May Street
Jacksonville, FL 32204

jharrell@appellate-firm.com
(904)-350-0075
Party name: Estate of Marianne Klemish, et al.
Other
Thomas Ryan McCarthy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy Park, PLLC
3033 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

tom@consovoymccarthy.com
703-243-9423
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543