Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-350
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-350
Title:PNC Bank National Association, et al., Petitioners
v.
Secure Axcess, LLC
Docketed:September 7, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2016-1353)
   Decision Date:February 21, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:June 6, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 04 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 10, 2017)
Sep 29 2017Waiver of right of respondent Secure Axcess LLC to respond filed.
Oct 04 2017Respondents amended Rule 29.6 Corporate Disclosure Statement received.
Oct 09 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Clearing House Payments Company, L.L.C. filed.
Oct 11 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017.
Oct 12 2017Response Requested. (Due November 13, 2017)
Nov 13 2017Brief of respondent Secure Axcess LLC in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 29 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Nov 29 2017Reply of petitioners PNC Bank National Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 24 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018The petition for a writ of certiorari is granted. The judgment is vacated as moot, and the case is remanded to the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit with instructions to remand the case to the Patent Trial and Appeal Board to vacate the Board's order. See United States v. Munsingwear, Inc., 340 U. S. 36 (1950). Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
Jun 15 2018JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

seth.waxman@wilmerhale.com
(202) 663-6000
Party name: PNC Bank National Assoc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Eric M. Albritton
    Counsel of Record
Eric M. Albritton, P.C. d/b/a Albritton Law Firm
P.O. Box 2649
Longview, TX 75606

ema@emafirm.com
9037578449
Party name: Secure Axcess LLC
Other
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

cphillips@sidley.com
(202) 736-8000
Party name: The Clearing House Payments Company, L.L.C.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543