Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-340
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-340
Title:New Prime Inc., Petitioner
v.
Dominic Oliveira
Docketed:September 6, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-2364)
   Decision Date:May 12, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:June 27, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 06 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 6, 2017)
Sep 21 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 6, 2017.
Oct 06 2017Brief amicus curiae of American Trucking Associations, Inc. filed.
Oct 06 2017Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Oct 27 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 20, 2017.
Nov 20 2017Brief of respondent Dominic Oliveira in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 01 2017Reply of petitioner New Prime Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Jan 04 2018Rescheduled.
Jan 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018.
Jan 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2018.
Feb 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/23/2018.
Feb 26 2018Petition GRANTED.
Mar 06 2018Motion for an extension of time filed.
Main Document
Mar 09 2018Motion to extend the time to file (the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits) granted and the time is extended to and including May 14, 2018. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 11, 2018.
May 14 2018Brief of petitioner New Prime Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2018Joint appendix filed. (Statement of cost filed).
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 21 2018Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 21 2018Brief amicus curiae of American Trucking Associations, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 21 2018Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 21 2018Brief amicus curiae of New England Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 21 2018Brief amicus curiae of Customized Logistics and Delivery Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 08 2018Motion of Dominic Oliveira for an extension of time submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Theodore J. Boutrous
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
333 South Grand Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90071

tboutrous@gibsondunn.com
213-229-7000
Party name: New Prime Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jennifer D. Bennett
    Counsel of Record
Public Justice
475 14th Street, Suite 610
Oakland, CA 94612

jbennett@publicjustice.net
(510) 622-8150
Party name: Dominic Oliveira
Other
Andrew Michael Grossman
    Counsel of Record
Baker & Hostetler LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20036

agrossman@bakerlaw.com
2028611697
Party name: Cato Institute
Robert G. Hulteng
    Counsel of Record
Littler, Mendelson, P.C.
333 Bush Street
34th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94104

rhulteng@littler.com
415-433-1940
Party name: Customized Logistics and Delivery Association
Richard Pianka
    Counsel of Record
ATA Litigation Center
950 North Glebe Road, Suite 210
Arlington, VA 22203

rpianka@trucking.org
(703)-838-1889
Party name: American Trucking Associations, Inc.
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown, LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3000
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Benjamin G. Robbins
    Counsel of Record
New England Legal Foundation
150 Lincoln Street
Boston, MA 02111-2504

benrobbins@nelfonline.org
8577727620
Party name: New England Legal Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543