Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-34
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-34
Title:Thomas R. Okrie, Petitioner
v.
Michigan, et al.
Docketed:July 5, 2017
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Michigan
   Case Numbers:(326607)
   Decision Date:June 16, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:January 5, 2017
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 28 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 4, 2017)
Aug 04 2017Waiver of right of respondents Michigan, et al. to respond filed.
Aug 23 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Oct 02 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gary P. Supanich
    Counsel of Record
Law Firm of Gary P. Supanich PLLC
117 North First Street, Suite 111
Ann Arbor, MI 48104

garypsupanich@yahoo.com
(734) 276-6561
Party name: Thomas R. Okrie
Attorneys for Respondents
Aaron D. Lindstrom Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Michigan Department of Attorney General
P.O. Box 30212
Lansing, MI 48909

517-373-1124
Party name: Michigan, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543