Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-290
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-290
Title:Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Petitioner
v.
Doris Albrecht, et al.
Docketed:August 24, 2017
Linked with 16A1264
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-1900)
   Decision Date:March 22, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:April 24, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 23 2017Application (16A1264) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 23, 2017 to August 22, 2017, submitted to Justice Alito.
Jun 27 2017Application (16A1264) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until August 22, 2017.
Aug 22 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 25, 2017)
Aug 31 2017Waiver of right of respondents Affronti, Joanne, et al. to respond filed.
Sep 11 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. on 09/12/2017
Sep 19 2017Waiver of right of respondents Esther Parker & Pamela Paralikis to respond filed.
Sep 20 2017Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, Albrecht, Doris, et al. on 09/21/2017
Sep 21 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 25, 2017, for all respondents.
Sep 22 2017Because Justice Alito now realizes that he should have recused himself from consideration of this application, the order of June 27, 2017, is vacated. Pursuant to Rule 22.2, the application (16A1264) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 23, 2017 to August 22, 2017, has been submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Sep 22 2017Application (16A1264) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until August 22, 2017. (Justice Alito is recused)
Sep 25 2017Brief amicus curiae of Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America filed.
Sep 25 2017Brief amici curiae of Product Liability Adisory Council, Inc., et al. filed.
Oct 25 2017Brief of respondents Doris Albrecht, et al. in opposition filed.
Nov 08 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2017.
Nov 08 2017Reply of petitioner Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. filed. (Distributed)
Dec 04 2017The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001-2113

sdvoretzky@jonesday.com
(202)-879-3939
Party name: Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
Attorneys for Respondents
Michael L. Beckman
    Counsel of Record
Viles & Beckman
6350 Presidential Court
Ft. Myers, FL 33919

239-334-3933
Party name: Esther Parker & Pamela Paralikis
David C. Frederick
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, PLLC
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

dfrederick@kellogghansen.com
(202)-326-7951
Party name: Doris Albrecht, et al.
Brian A. Goldstein
    Counsel of Record
Cellino& Barnes, P.C.
2500 Main Place Tower, 350 Main Street
Buffalo, NY 14202-3725

brian.goldenstein@cellinoandbarnes.com
716-888-8888
Party name: Affronti, Joanne, et al.
Other
Robert Allen Long Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling, LLP
One CityCenter
850 Tenth St., NW
Washington, DC 20001

rlong@cov.com
(202) 662-6000
Party name: Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America
Alan Edward Untereiner
    Counsel of Record
Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber, LLP
1801 K Street, N.W.
Suite 411L
Washington, DC 20006

auntereiner@robbinsrussell.com
202-775-4500
Party name: Product Liability Adisory Council, Inc., et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543